DC B23-0486 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on November 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Law L23-0056, Effective from Feb 27, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2475, Expires on Oct 09, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on November 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Law L23-0056, Effective from Feb 27, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2475, Expires on Oct 09, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sanctuary Values Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Sanctuary Values Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-22 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Council | Law L23-0056, Effective from Feb 27, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2475, Expires on Oct 09, 2020 |
2019-11-26 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-11-22 | Council | Act A23-0162 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15343 |
2019-11-19 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-11-18 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0162 |
2019-11-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 19, 2019 |
2019-10-22 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-10-22 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0486 Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-08 | Council | First Reading |
2019-10-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |