DC B23-0485 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-01 - Act A23-0131 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14298, Expires on Jan 21, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-01 - Act A23-0131 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14298, Expires on Jan 21, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sanctuary Values Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Sanctuary Values Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-01 | Council | Act A23-0131 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14298, Expires on Jan 21, 2020 |
2019-10-24 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-10-23 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0131, Expires on Jan 21, 2020 |
2019-10-22 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 25, 2019 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-10-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |