DC B23-0483 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Indigenous Peoples' Day Emergency Amendment Act Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indigenous Peoples' Day Emergency Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-08 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-22CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-10-11CouncilSigned with Act Number A23-0128
2019-10-11CouncilEnacted with Act Number A23-0128
2019-10-10CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 25, 2019
2019-10-08CouncilFinal Reading
2019-10-08CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback