DC B23-0481 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-01 - Act A23-0150 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14352, Expires on Jan 26, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-01 - Act A23-0150 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14352, Expires on Jan 26, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Close Relative Caregiver Subsidy Pilot Program Establishment Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Close Relative Caregiver Subsidy Pilot Program Establishment Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-01 | Council | Act A23-0150 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14352, Expires on Jan 26, 2020 |
2019-10-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-10-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0150, Expires on Jan 26, 2020 |
2019-10-22 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 29, 2019 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-10-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |