DC B23-0477 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-01 - Act A23-0130 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14296, Expires on Jan 21, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-01 - Act A23-0130 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14296, Expires on Jan 21, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Student Activity Fund Theatrical and Music Performance Expenditures Emergency Act of 2019
Title
Student Activity Fund Theatrical and Music Performance Expenditures Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-01 | Council | Act A23-0130 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14296, Expires on Jan 21, 2020 |
2019-10-24 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-10-23 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0130, Expires on Jan 21, 2020 |
2019-10-22 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 25, 2019 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-10-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |