DC B23-0474 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0082, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5004
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-82 orders the legal closing of 4th Street N.E., between Kennedy Street N.E., and Ingraham Street N.E., the closing of the public alley in Square 3765, and the elimination of building restrictions lines along 4th Street N.E., Kennedy Street N.E., and Ingraham, Street N.E., abutting Squares 3765 and 3765. S.O. 18-41561, in Ward 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Closing of Public Street and Alley and Elimination of Building Restriction Lines and abutting Squares 3765 and 3767, S.O. 18-41561, Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15CouncilLaw L23-0082, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5004
2020-03-06CouncilAct A23-0228 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2501
2020-03-05CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-02-28CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-02-27CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0228
2020-02-18CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 3, 2020
2020-02-04CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-01-16CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-01-07CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2019-12-17CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0474
2019-11-07CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-10-22CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-10-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-11CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0474 Published in the DC Register
2019-10-07CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback