DC B23-0457 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 15 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-01 - Act A23-0153 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14362, Expires on Jan 27, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 15 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-01 - Act A23-0153 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14362, Expires on Jan 27, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wells School Designation and Master Facilities Plan Disapproval Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Wells School Designation and Master Facilities Plan Disapproval Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-01 | Council | Act A23-0153 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14362, Expires on Jan 27, 2020 |
2019-10-30 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0153, Expires on Jan 27, 2020 |
2019-10-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-10-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 29, 2019 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-10-08 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |