DC B23-0456 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0487 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13899
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0487 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13899
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-456 authorizes the Office of the Attorney General to issue subpoenas for documents and testimony as part of a receivership investigation and clarifies the basis for the appointment of a Housing Receiver. It authorizes the Court to order anyone in the care and control of the property to contribute funds in excess of the rents to abate violations. It provides for the relocation of displaced tenants and the upkeep and debts of the building while in receivership. It establishes when a receivership can be terminated and clarifies when the court can enjoin the respondents.
Title
Abatement and Condemnation of Nuisance Properties Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Council | Act A23-0487 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13899 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0487 |
2020-11-02 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 17, 2020 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-10-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-06 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-10-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0456 |
2020-01-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-12-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0456 Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-10-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |