DC B23-0449 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Act A23-0311 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5095
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-449 symbolically designates S Street, N.W., and 17th Street, N.W., as Kappa Alpha Psi Way.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kappa Alpha Psi Way Designation Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15CouncilAct A23-0311 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5095
2020-05-12CouncilTransmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Jun 29, 2020
2020-05-05CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-04-27CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0311
2020-04-17CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020
2020-04-07CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-03-03CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-02-19CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-02-18CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0449
2019-11-26CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-10-25CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-08CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-10-04CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0449 Published in the DC Register
2019-09-24CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback