DC B23-0445 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-08 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-445 requires the Department of Insurance, Securities, and Banking to provide for the licensing and registration of certain entities providing appraisal management services in the District of Columbia. Appraisal management services includes recruiting, selecting, and retaining appraisers and managing the process of having an appraisal performed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appraisal Management Company Regulation Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-08CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-09-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-09-27CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0445 Published in the DC Register
2019-09-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2019-09-17CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback