DC B23-0443 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-443 establishes, as a separate agency, in the Office of the Deputy Mayor for Public Safety and Justice cluster of agencies, an Office on Returning Citizen Affairs.
Title
Moving the Office on Returning Citizen Affairs Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-12-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0443 Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Procurement |
2019-09-17 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0443 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43177/Introduction/B23-0443-Introduction.pdf |