DC B23-0437 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-437 establishes the Office of the Child Safety and Well-Being Ombudsperson as part of the Citizen Review Panel on Child Abuse and Neglect of the District of Columbia. The Citizen Review Panel on Child Abuse and Neglect shall appoint the Ombudsperson with a majority vote of attending members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Safety and Well-Being Ombudsperson Establishment Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-18CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-10-28CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-10-11CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-09-27CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0437 Published in the DC Register
2019-09-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Human Services
2019-09-17CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback