DC B23-0434 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0090, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-90 prohibits the District government from interfering with reproductive health decisions and from imposing punishments or penalties for a self-managed abortion, miscarriage, or adverse pregnancy outcomes. It also prohibits employment discrimination against healthcare professionals who would participate in abortion or sterilization procedures. FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Strengthening Reproductive Health Protections Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15CouncilLaw L23-0090, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5011
2020-03-27CouncilAct A23-0264 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3537
2020-03-25CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-03-24CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-03-23CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0264
2020-03-09CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 23, 2020
2020-03-03CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-02-04CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-01-28CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-01-22CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0434
2019-12-19CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-11-15CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-09-27CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0434 Published in the DC Register
2019-09-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations
2019-09-17CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback