DC B23-0430 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 30 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 13, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, Bill 23-430 authorizes licensed pharmacists to dispense interchangeable biological products, and requires notifications to physicians when such interchangeable biological products are dispensed. An interchangeable biological product is a biological product licensed by the US Food and Drug Administration to meet the standards of interchangeability under federal law and determined to be therapeutically equivalent by the USFDA.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to Biosimilars Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 13, 2020
2020-07-21CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-07-07CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-07-01CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-07-01CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0430
2019-11-13CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-11-13CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-11-08CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-09-27CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0430 Published in the DC Register
2019-09-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2019-09-17CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback