DC B23-0409 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-409 limits criminal defenses and authorization for the use of force relating to a victim's sexual orientation or gender identity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual Orientation And Gender Identity Panic Defense Prohibition Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-09-27CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-09-20CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0409 Published in the DC Register
2019-09-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2019-09-16CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback