DC B23-0407 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-407 reduces the amount of acceptable levels of lead exposure and requires an owner to provide a clearance report before receiving any license, registration, or permit for the use of a rental unit. Among other things, it establishes the Indoor Lead Hazard Reduction Fund to provide assistance in bringing dwelling units constructed before 1978 and occupied by low-income tenants into compliance with the requirements of the act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lead Hazard Prevention And Elimination Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-18CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-11-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-25CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-09-20CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0407 Published in the DC Register
2019-09-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2019-07-09CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback