DC B23-0402 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Law L23-0153, Effective from Dec 08, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Law L23-0153, Effective from Dec 08, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-402 enables a parent, legal guardian, or legal custodian who is, or may be subject to an adverse immigration action, to make short-term plans for a child without terminating or limiting their parental or custodial rights.
Title
Standby Guardian Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Council | Law L23-0153, Effective from Dec 08, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00002 |
2020-10-23 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-10-23 | Council | Act A23-0419 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12259 |
2020-10-15 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-10-14 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0419 |
2020-09-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 14, 2020 |
2020-09-22 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-07-21 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-07-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-07-15 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0402 |
2019-10-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Human Services |
2019-07-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0402 Published in the DC Register |
2019-07-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |