DC B23-0390 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0080, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law 23-80 clarifies the soil testing requirements for the urban farm tax abatement and allows the District to enter into a lease agreement with a qualified applicant to create and maintain an urban farm on vacant land. It also allows the Department of Energy and the Environment to waive soil testing requirements for a lessee who does not plant in or use the site soil, but instead uses, for example, raised beds, greenhouses, or hydroponic towers and ensures that the produce does not come into contact with the site soil. FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urban Farming Land Lease Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15CouncilLaw L23-0080, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5002
2020-03-06CouncilAct A23-0226 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2494
2020-03-05CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-02-28CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-02-27CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0226
2020-02-18CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 3, 2020
2020-02-04CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-01-07CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2019-12-11CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-12-11CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0390
2019-11-18CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-11-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-25CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-07-19CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0390 Published in the DC Register
2019-07-09CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2019-07-09CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback