DC B23-0384 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 19 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-17 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Standby Guardian Emergency Amendment Act Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standby Guardian Emergency Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-17CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-07-19CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 2, 2019
2019-07-09CouncilFinal Reading
2019-07-09CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback