DC B23-0383 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Law L23-0029, Effective from Nov 26, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16307, Expires on Jul 08, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appraisal Management Company Regulation Temporary Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appraisal Management Company Regulation Temporary Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-20CouncilLaw L23-0029, Effective from Nov 26, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16307, Expires on Jul 08, 2020
2019-10-11CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2019-10-11CouncilAct A23-0117 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13124
2019-10-07CouncilReturned from Mayor
2019-10-07CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0117
2019-09-23CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 7, 2019
2019-09-17CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2019-09-17CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-07-12CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0383 Published in the DC Register
2019-07-09CouncilFirst Reading
2019-07-09CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback