DC B23-0377 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Law L23-0027, Effective from Nov 26, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16305, Expires on Jul 08, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Law L23-0027, Effective from Nov 26, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16305, Expires on Jul 08, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urban Farming Land Lease Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Urban Farming Land Lease Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Council | Law L23-0027, Effective from Nov 26, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16305, Expires on Jul 08, 2020 |
2019-10-11 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-10-11 | Council | Act A23-0115 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13118 |
2019-10-07 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-10-07 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0115 |
2019-09-24 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 8, 2019 |
2019-09-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-09-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-07-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0377 Published in the DC Register |
2019-07-09 | Council | First Reading |
2019-07-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |