DC B23-0375 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Act A23-0104 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9748, Expires on Oct 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Act A23-0104 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9748, Expires on Oct 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legitimate Theater Sidewalk Cafe Authorization Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Legitimate Theater Sidewalk Cafe Authorization Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Council | Act A23-0104 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9748, Expires on Oct 21, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-07-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0104, Expires on Oct 21, 2019 |
2019-07-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2019 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-07-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-07-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |