DC B23-0365 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it creates a new category to allow for additional funding to schools that have an at risk student population of 70 percent and above.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Critical Risk Rate School Funding Designation Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-01-31CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-01-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-06-28CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0365 Published in the DC Register
2019-06-25CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2019-06-25CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback