DC B23-0362 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it requires individual or group health plans and health insurance coverage through Medicaid or the D.C. Healthcare Alliance program to cover at least two postpartum healthcare visits, home visits, fertility preservation services, and transportation stipends for travel to and from prenatal and postpartum visits. It also requires Medicaid to provide coverage for pregnant District residents that meet income eligibility requirements for one year postpartum. Among other things it establishes a Center on Maternal Health and Wellness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maternal Health Care Improvement And Expansion Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-18CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-11-08CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-06-28CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0362 Published in the DC Register
2019-06-25CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2019-06-25CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback