DC B23-0359 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0486 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13886
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0486 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13886
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires the Department of Transportation to create rules governing electric mobility devices. It requires a permit to operate an electric mobility device fleet. It establishes fleet maintenance requirements. It requires a 24 hour hotline to report complaints regarding fleets. It bans the use of electric scooters between 10pm and 4am. Among other things it also limits the speed of electric mobility devices.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents".
Title
Electric Mobility Devices Amendment Act of 2019 (aka "Shared Fleet Devices Amendment Act of 2020")
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Council | Act A23-0486 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13886 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0486 |
2020-11-02 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 17, 2020 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-10-20 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau) |
2020-10-06 | Council | Amendment (Allen) |
2020-10-06 | Council | First Reading |
2020-09-22 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-09-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0359 |
2019-11-04 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0359 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-25 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-06-25 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |