DC B23-0358 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is November 7, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Close Relative Caregiver Subsidy Pilot Program Establishment Temporary Amendment Act Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Close Relative Caregiver Subsidy Pilot Program Establishment Temporary Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11CouncilTransmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is November 7, 2019
2019-09-04CouncilSigned with Act Number A23-0113
2019-09-04CouncilEnacted with Act Number A23-0113
2019-08-20CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on September 4, 2019
2019-07-09CouncilFinal Reading CC
2019-07-09CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-06-28CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0358 Published in the DC Register
2019-06-25CouncilFirst Reading
2019-06-25CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback