DC B23-0352 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Act A23-0091 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8497, Expires on Oct 20, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Act A23-0091 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8497, Expires on Oct 20, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2020 Budget Support Emergency Act of 2019
Title
Fiscal Year 2020 Budget Support Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | Council | Act A23-0091 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8497, Expires on Oct 20, 2019 |
2019-07-22 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-07-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0091, Expires on Oct 20, 2019 |
2019-07-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2019 |
2019-06-25 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-06-25 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-06-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |