DC B23-0335 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Act A23-0077 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8089, Expires on Oct 06, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Act A23-0077 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8089, Expires on Oct 06, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Marijuana Program Patient Employment Protection Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Medical Marijuana Program Patient Employment Protection Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Council | Act A23-0077 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8089, Expires on Oct 06, 2019 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-07-08 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0077, Expires on Oct 06, 2019 |
2019-06-27 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 12, 2019 |
2019-06-25 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-06-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-06-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |