DC B23-0332 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0079, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-79 removes from the Plan of Permanent Systems of Highways a portion of Anacostia Avenue, N.E., located within Lot 806 in Square 5113.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abandonment of the Highway Plan for Anacostia Avenue, N.E., S.O. 19-04866, Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15CouncilLaw L23-0079, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5001
2020-03-06CouncilAct A23-0225 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2492
2020-03-05CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-02-28CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-02-27CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0225
2020-02-14CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2020
2020-02-04CouncilFinal Reading
2020-02-04CouncilAmendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson)
2020-01-16CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-01-07CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2019-12-17CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0332
2019-11-07CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-10-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-06-21CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0332 Published in the DC Register
2019-06-18CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-06-07CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback