DC B23-0328 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Law L23-0064, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3079
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-64 closes a portion of the public alley system in Square 5017, bounded by Benning Road, N.E., 36th Street, N.E., Eads Street, N.E., and 34th Street, N.E., in Ward 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Closing of a Public Alley in Square 5017, S.O. 16-24507, Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20CouncilLaw L23-0064, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3079
2020-01-27CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-01-24CouncilAct A23-0196 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 579
2020-01-17CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-01-16CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0196
2020-01-07CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 22, 2020
2019-12-17CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2019-12-13CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-12-03CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2019-11-19CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0328
2019-10-10CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-09-20CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-06-18CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-06-14CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0328 Published in the DC Register
2019-06-06CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback