DC B23-0325 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Act A23-0525 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14750
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Act A23-0525 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14750
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires dementia training for direct care workers, which includes staff whose work involves extensive contact with residents or program participants of residential facilities or home-and community-based programs that provide supportive services.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents".
Title
Dementia Training for Direct Care Workers Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-17 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - Postponed to November 17, 2020 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - Postponed to November 17, 2020 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-25 | Council | Act A23-0525 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14750 |
2020-12-21 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0525 |
2020-12-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2020 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Amendment (Gray) |
2020-11-17 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-11-10 | Council | Postponed to November 17, 2020 |
2020-10-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-10-14 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0325 |
2019-12-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-11-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0325 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-06-04 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |