DC B23-0319 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires that the Board of Election mail all registered qualified electors a ballot for primary, general, special elections, recall initiatives and referendums. Qualified electors will have a three-week window in which to mail in ballots.
Title
Vote by Mail Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0319 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-06-04 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0319 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42713/Introduction/B23-0319-Introduction.pdf |