DC B23-0316 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it re-establishes the Tax Revision Commission and requires the Commission to submit a report of recommendations once every 10 years to consider revisions to the tax code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Revision Commission Reestablishment Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-08-07CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-07-29CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-06-14CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0316 Published in the DC Register
2019-06-04CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-06-04CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback