DC B23-0315 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it establishes a grant program to provide funding to District employers to hire and retain eligible veterans. Eligible veterans are District residents who were honorably discharged with a 50% or more service-related disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

District Veteran Employment Grant Program Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-07-31CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-07-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-06-07CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0315 Published in the DC Register
2019-06-04CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations
2019-05-28CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback