DC B23-0314 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act A23-0066 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7606, Expires on Sep 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act A23-0066 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7606, Expires on Sep 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 3 and 4 to Contract No. CW47741 with AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Title
Modification Nos. 3 and 4 to Contract No. CW47741 with AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Council | Act A23-0066 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7606, Expires on Sep 17, 2019 |
2019-06-20 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-06-19 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0066, Expires on Sep 17, 2019 |
2019-06-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 21, 2019 |
2019-06-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-06-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-05-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |