DC B23-0302 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0160, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0160, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it designates the Little Brown Bat as the official state mammal of the District of Columbia.
Title
Little Brown Bat Official State Mammal Designation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-22 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-22 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Law L23-0160, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000734 |
2020-11-13 | Council | Act A23-0471 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13256 |
2020-11-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-11-03 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-02 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0471 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 3, 2020 |
2020-10-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-09-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-09-22 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-09-22 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0302 |
2020-01-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-12-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0302 Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-28 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-05-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |