DC B23-0299 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires a marginal tax on high value homes in the District.
Title
Residential Real Property Taxes Equitable Alignment Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-05-28 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-05-17 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0299 Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0299 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42561/Introduction/B23-0299-Introduction.pdf |