DC B23-0298 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Law L23-0008, Effective from Aug 06, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 10500, Expires on Mar 18, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Primary Date Alteration Temporary Amendment Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Primary Date Alteration Temporary Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16CouncilLaw L23-0008, Effective from Aug 06, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 10500, Expires on Mar 18, 2020
2019-06-24CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2019-06-21CouncilAct A23-0059 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7343
2019-06-18CouncilReturned from Mayor
2019-06-17CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0059
2019-06-04CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 18, 2019
2019-05-28CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2019-05-17CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0298 Published in the DC Register
2019-05-14CouncilFirst Reading
2019-05-14CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-05-09CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback