DC B23-0293 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it specifies the questions relating to bicyclists that the Department of Motor Vehicles is required to quiz driver license applicants about on the driver's license examination; it also establishes a public outreach campaign.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cyclist Safety Campaign Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-24CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-10-04CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-09-20CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-09-06CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-05-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0293 Published in the DC Register
2019-05-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2019-05-07CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback