DC B23-0291 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-20 - Law L23-0066, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3081
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-20 - Law L23-0066, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3081
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-66 allows the Juvenile Services Program of the Public Defender Service to provide youth in the custody of the Department of Youth Rehabilitation Services education on legal rights, access to counsel, information and legal support.
Title
Detained Youth Access to the Juvenile Services Program Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | Council | Law L23-0066, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3081 |
2020-01-31 | Council | Act A23-0202 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 740 |
2020-01-27 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-01-22 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0202 |
2020-01-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 21, 2020 |
2019-12-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-12-03 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2019-11-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-11-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0291 |
2019-10-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-09-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0291 Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Recreation and Youth Affairs |
2019-05-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |