DC B23-0289 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0159, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0159, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it symbolically designates the 2200 block of Mount View Place, S.E. in Ward 8, as Hannah Hawkins Way.
Title
Hannah Hawkins Way Designation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Law L23-0159, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000733 |
2020-11-13 | Council | Act A23-0470 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13254 |
2020-11-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-11-03 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-02 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0470 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 3, 2020 |
2020-09-22 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-09-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-07-21 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-07-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0289 |
2020-01-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-12-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0289 Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-05-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |