DC B23-0287 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Law L23-0017, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12632, Expires on Apr 23, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Law L23-0017, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12632, Expires on Apr 23, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms Safety Omnibus Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Firearms Safety Omnibus Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Council - Postponed to June 25, 2019 Legislative Meeting (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Council - Postponed to June 25, 2019 Legislative Meeting (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Council | Law L23-0017, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12632, Expires on Apr 23, 2020 |
2019-07-30 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-07-26 | Council | Act A23-0093 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8741 |
2019-07-22 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-07-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0093 |
2019-07-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 22, 2019 |
2019-06-25 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-06-04 | Council | Postponed to June 25, 2019 Legislative Meeting |
2019-05-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-05-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0287 Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-07 | Council | First Reading |
2019-05-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |