DC B23-0286 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms Safety Omnibus Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Firearms Safety Omnibus Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-05-24 | Council | Act A23-0049 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6310, Expires on Aug 14, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-05-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0049, Expires on Aug 14, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-05-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |