DC B23-0285 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Law L23-0014, Effective from Aug 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12343, Expires on Apr 05, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adams Morgan Business Improvement District Temporary Amendment Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adams Morgan Business Improvement District Temporary Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-20CouncilLaw L23-0014, Effective from Aug 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12343, Expires on Apr 05, 2020
2019-07-15CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2019-07-12CouncilAct A23-0071 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8063
2019-07-03CouncilReturned from Mayor
2019-07-01CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0071
2019-06-24CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 9, 2019
2019-06-04CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2019-05-28CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-05-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0285 Published in the DC Register
2019-05-07CouncilFirst Reading
2019-05-07CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback