DC B23-0281 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Law L23-0117, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8978
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law 23-117 allows the Public Charter School Board to impose interim conditions upon revocation or non-renewal of a charter during a closing school's final months of operation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Charter School Closure Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-24CouncilLaw L23-0117, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8978
2020-05-15CouncilAct A23-0309 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5088
2020-05-12CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-05-05CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-04-27CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0309
2020-04-17CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020
2020-04-07CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-03-03CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-02-20CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-02-18CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0281
2019-11-15CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-11-12CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0281
2019-10-02CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-05-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-05-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0281 Published in the DC Register
2019-05-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2019-05-06CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback