DC B23-0275 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it requires that freestanding clinics be licensed and clarifies the Department of Health's authority to develop rulemaking on specific aspects of clinic operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clinics Licensing Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-05-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0275 Published in the DC Register
2019-05-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2019-05-01CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback