DC B23-0269 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Law Number L23-0116 Effective from Jun 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law 23-116 establishes time frames for a health professional employer to report action taken against a health professional to a board, commission, or authority and creates sanctions for failure to comply. It also requires a health professional to submit to a board, commission or authority responsible for licensing, registering, or certifying the health professional within 10 business days’ notice of a malpractice judgment, settlement, or that the health professional has been convicted of a crime. Among other things it requires the Health Occupations Boards to ensure that a practitioner or dispenser is registered with the prescription drug monitoring program before renewing, reactivating, or reinstating a license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Reporting Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24CouncilLaw Number L23-0116 Effective from Jun 24, 2020
2020-05-15CouncilAct A23-0308 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5081
2020-05-12CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-05-05CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-04-27CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0308
2020-04-17CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020
2020-04-07CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-03-03CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-02-12CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-01-29CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0269
2019-06-26CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-05-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-05-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-05-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2019-05-03CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0269 Published in the DC Register
2019-04-22CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback