DC B23-0266 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it prohibits marijuana testing as a condition of employment unless required by law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibition Of Marijuana Testing Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-25CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-06-21CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-04-26CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0266 Published in the DC Register
2019-04-23CouncilReferred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2019-04-23CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback