DC B23-0264 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-03 - Law L23-0099, Effective from Jun 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8040
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-03 - Law L23-0099, Effective from Jun 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8040
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-99 designates the Benning Park Community Center, located at Southern Avenue, S.E. and Fable Street, S.E. in Ward 7, as the Woody Ward Recreation Center.
Title
Woody Ward Recreation Center Designation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-03 | Council | Law L23-0099, Effective from Jun 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8040 |
2020-05-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-04-10 | Council | Act A23-0269 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3930 |
2020-04-02 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-03-26 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0269 |
2020-03-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 27, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-02-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-02-04 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-02-04 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0264 |
2019-11-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0264 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-23 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |