DC B23-0263 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0157, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000731
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0157, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000731
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it designates the school bounded by 48th Place, N.E., Fitch Place, N.E., and 49th Street, N.E. in Ward 7, as the Lorraine H. Whitlock Elementary School.
Title
Lorraine H. Whitlock Elementary School Designation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-22 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-22 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Law L23-0157, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000731 |
2020-11-13 | Council | Act A23-0469 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13252 |
2020-11-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-11-03 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-02 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0469 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 3, 2020 |
2020-10-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-09-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-09-22 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-09-22 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0263 |
2019-06-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0263 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-23 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |